EP0054087 - Apparatus and method for antibody screening, typing and compatibility testing of red blood cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.1983 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENGINEERING & RESEARCH ASSOCIATES, INC. Era Plaza, 100 N. Tucson Boulevard Tucson Arizona 85716 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/25] | For all designated states ENGINEERING & RESEARCH ASSOCIATE, INC Era Plaza 500 N. Tucson Boulevard Tucson, Arizona 85716 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barr, Lawrence D. 1169 N. Whinstel Boulevard Tucson, Arizona 85716 / US | [1982/25] | Representative(s) | Potter, Willoughby Whatnall 14 Oxford Street Nottingham NG1 5BP / GB | [1982/25] | Application number, filing date | 80304448.6 | 10.12.1980 | [1982/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0054087 | Date: | 23.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/48, G01N33/54 | [1982/25] | CPC: |
G01N35/00732 (EP,US);
G01N33/48 (EP,US);
G01N33/5302 (EP,US);
G01N33/80 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00752 (EP,US);
G01N35/1079 (EP,US);
Y10S436/807 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Untersuchung und Bestimmung von Antikörpern und zur Verträglichkeitsbestimmung von roten Blutzellen | [1982/25] | English: | Apparatus and method for antibody screening, typing and compatibility testing of red blood cells | [1982/25] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'examen et de détermination d'anticorps et pour déterminer la compatibilité de globules rouges sanguins | [1982/25] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 21.03.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1983/35] | 02.06.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3705048 [ ] (STAUNTON JOHN J J); | DE2417338 [ ] (ORTHO PHARMA CORP); | GB1459903 [ ] (ORTHO PHARMA CORP); | US4066407 [ ] (LUPICA VINCENT); | US4092120 [ ] (SUOVANIEMI OSMO, et al); | US4197088 [ ] (ACKER JESSE L [US], et al) |