EP0031693 - Promoted tin-antimonate catalysts and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.1986 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE STANDARD OIL COMPANY Midland Building Cleveland, Ohio 44115 / US | [1981/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grasselli, Robert Karl 150 Greentree Road Chagrin Falls Ohio 44022 / US | 02 /
Brazdil, James Frank 5195 Haverford Drive Lyndhurst Ohio 44124 / US | 03 /
Suresh, Dev Dhanaraj 1052 Iroquois Run Macedonia Ohio 44056 / US | 04 /
Ratka, Frances Irene 3595 Woodridge Cleveland Heights Ohio 44121 / US | [1981/27] | Representative(s) | Smith, Sydney, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/27] | Smith, Sydney, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 80304631.7 | 19.12.1980 | [1981/27] | Priority number, date | US19790107964 | 28.12.1979 Original published format: US 107964 | [1981/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0031693 | Date: | 08.07.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B01J27/02 | [1981/27] | CPC: |
B01J27/0576 (EP,US);
B01J23/54 (KR);
B01J23/002 (EP,US);
B01J23/8885 (EP,US);
C07C253/26 (EP,US);
C07C45/34 (EP,US);
C07C45/35 (EP,US);
C07C5/48 (EP,US);
C07C51/252 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00 (EP,US);
C07C2521/02 (EP,US);
C07C2521/06 (EP,US);
C07C2521/10 (EP,US);
C07C2523/02 (EP,US);
C07C2523/04 (EP,US);
C07C2523/06 (EP,US);
C07C2523/10 (EP,US);
C07C2523/12 (EP,US);
C07C2523/14 (EP,US);
C07C2523/18 (EP,US);
C07C2523/20 (EP,US);
C07C2523/22 (EP,US);
C07C2523/28 (EP,US);
C07C2523/30 (EP,US);
C07C2523/34 (EP,US);
C07C2523/50 (EP,US);
C07C2523/72 (EP,US);
C07C2523/75 (EP,US);
C07C2523/755 (EP,US);
C07C2527/057 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C253/26, C07C255/08 (US,EP);
C07C45/35, C07C47/22 (US,EP);
C07C51/252, C07C57/04 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/17, B01J2523/43, B01J2523/47, B01J2523/53, B01J2523/64, B01J2523/68 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/17, B01J2523/43, B01J2523/53, B01J2523/55, B01J2523/64, B01J2523/68, B01J2523/69 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/17, B01J2523/43, B01J2523/53, B01J2523/64 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/17, B01J2523/43, B01J2523/53, B01J2523/64, B01J2523/68 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/17, B01J2523/43, B01J2523/53, B01J2523/64, B01J2523/69 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/17, B01J2523/43, B01J2523/55, B01J2523/64, B01J2523/68, B01J2523/69 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/43, B01J2523/53, B01J2523/64, B01J2523/68 (US,EP) (-) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/27] | Title | German: | Zinn-Antimonat-Katalysatoren mit Promotoren und deren Verwendung | [1981/27] | English: | Promoted tin-antimonate catalysts and use thereof | [1981/27] | French: | Catalyseurs d'antimoniate d'étain avec promoteurs et leur utilisation | [1981/27] | File destroyed: | 01.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 16.12.1981 | Examination requested [1982/08] | 29.07.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.07.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/52] | 06.08.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1986/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.01.1986 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0000564 [ ] (STANDARD OIL CO OHIO [US]) |