EP0020244 - Method and device for addressing a teletext image buffer memory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.1984 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.06.1984 [1984/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Etablissement Public Télédiffusion de France 10, rue d'Oradour-sur-Glane 75015 Paris / FR | For all designated states COMPAGNIE CONTINENTALE DE SIGNALISATION 36 avenue du Docteur-Marie F-94310 Orly / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1980/25] | For all designated states Etablissement Public Télédiffusion de France 10, rue d'Oradour-sur-Glane F-75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states COMPAGNIE CONTINENTALE DE SIGNALISATION 36 avenue du Docteur-Marie F-94310 Orly / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hernandez, Charles 85 avenue de Paris F-94800 Villejuif / FR | [1980/25] | Representative(s) | Bloch, Robert, et al 2, square de l'Avenue du Bois F-75116 Paris / FR | [1980/25] | Application number, filing date | 80400711.0 | 21.05.1980 | [1980/25] | Priority number, date | FR19790013240 | 23.05.1979 Original published format: FR 7913240 | [1980/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0020244 | Date: | 10.12.1980 | Language: | FR | [1980/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0020244 | Date: | 11.02.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0020244 | Date: | 04.05.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1980 | Classification | IPC: | G09G1/16, G09G1/02, H04N7/04 | [1980/25] | CPC: |
G09G5/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1980/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Adressieren eines Bildwiederholungsspeichers in einem Teletext-System | [1980/25] | English: | Method and device for addressing a teletext image buffer memory | [1980/25] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour l'adressage d'une mémoire d'image dans un système de télétexte | [1980/25] | Examination procedure | 31.03.1981 | Examination requested [1981/23] | 23.06.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.08.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3659283 (OPHIR DAVID); | [A]US3794970 (PEARSON K, et al); | [A]US3955189 (THOMSON DOUGLAS H); | [A]FR2344927 (SPERRY RAND CORP [US]); | [A]FR2367318 (DATA GENERAL CORP [US]); | [A]GB1515309 (MULLARD LTD) |