EP0022416 - Process for the hydrogenation of semiconductor devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/02] | Process and apparatus for the hydrogenation of semiconductor devices | ||
[1983/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.1984 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.1984 [1984/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE Etablissement de Caractère Scientifique Technique et Industriel B.P. 510 75752 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/02] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE Etablissement de Caractère Scientifique Technique et Industriel B.P. 510 F-75752 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chenevas-Paule, André 42, Rue de Stalingrad F-38100 Grenoble / FR | 02 /
Le Goascoz, Vincent Le Village du Rif No 39 F-38640 Claix / FR | 03 /
Viktorovitch, Pierre 1, rue des Poilus F-38000 Grenoble / FR | [1981/02] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1981/02] | Application number, filing date | 80401024.7 | 04.07.1980 | [1981/02] | Priority number, date | FR19790017598 | 06.07.1979 Original published format: FR 7917598 | [1981/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0022416 | Date: | 14.01.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0022416 | Date: | 13.07.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/322, H01L21/31, H01L21/28 | [1981/02] | CPC: |
H01L21/3003 (EP,US);
H01L21/3105 (EP,US);
Y10S148/024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL [1981/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Hydrogenieren von Halbleitervorrichtungen | [1983/28] | English: | Process for the hydrogenation of semiconductor devices | [1983/28] | French: | Procédé d'hydrogénation de dispositifs à semi-conducteurs | [1983/28] |
Former [1981/02] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Hydrogenieren von Halbleitervorrichtungen | ||
Former [1981/02] | Process and apparatus for the hydrogenation of semiconductor devices | ||
Former [1981/02] | Procédé et appareil d'hydrogénation de dispositifs à semi-conducteurs | Examination procedure | 03.06.1981 | Examination requested [1981/34] | 03.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.12.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2324719 [ ] (ELEKTROMAT VEB); | DE2601288 [ ] (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | US4113514 [ ] (PANKOVE JACQUES ISAAC, et al) | [ ] - IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, Vol. SC-13, No. 4, Aout 1978 New York (US) T.P. MA et al.: "Effects of RF annealing on the excess charge centers in MIS dielectrics", pages 445-454 * Page 446, colonne 2, paragraphe 2; page 447, colonne 1, paragraphe 1; page 449, colonne 2, paragraphe 3 - page 451, colonne 2, paragraphe 2; page 452, colonne 2, paragraphe 3 - page 453, colonne 1, paragraphe 1; page 453, colonne 2, paragraphe 2 * | [ ] - JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, Vol. 126, No. 6, Juin 1979 Princeton (US) S. IWAMATSU et al.: "A method for reducing the hole and electron trapping densities in thermal SiO2 films", pages 1078-1080 * Page 1078, colonne 1, paragraphe 2 - colonne 2, paragraphe 1 * | [ ] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Vol. 22, No. 8B, Janvier 1980 New York (US) H.J. HOVEL: "Surface-interfacestate passivation", page 3879 * Page 3879 * |