EP0022418 - Process for the preparation of ergotamine and of alcaloids of the ergotoxine group [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1984 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1990 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 18.07.1990 [1990/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIERRE FABRE S.A. 125, rue de la Faisanderie 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/02] | For all designated states PIERRE FABRE S.A. 125, rue de la Faisanderie F-75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hatinguais, Philippe "Le Landou" Chemin de Bel Air F-81100 Castres / FR | 02 /
Tarroux, Roger 122, rue Théron Périer F-81100 Castres / FR | [1981/02] | Representative(s) | Corre, Jacques, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 26, Avenue Kléber 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/02] | Corre, Jacques Denis Paul, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 80401033.8 | 09.07.1980 | [1981/02] | Priority number, date | FR19790017860 | 10.07.1979 Original published format: FR 7917860 | [1981/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0022418 | Date: | 14.01.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0022418 | Date: | 11.05.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C07D519/02 | [1981/02] | CPC: |
C07D519/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Ergotamin und Alkaloiden der Ergotoxin-Gruppe | [1981/02] | English: | Process for the preparation of ergotamine and of alcaloids of the ergotoxine group | [1981/02] | French: | Procédé de préparation de l'ergotamine et des alcaloides du groupe ergotoxine | [1981/02] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1980 | Examination requested [1981/02] | 18.08.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.05.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.10.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2089081 [ ] (LEK TOVARNA FARMACEVTSKIH) | Examination | DE697760 |