EP0023865 - New glycolipid compounds, process for preparation and use as immunological adjuvant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.1982 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/06] | For all designated states MERCK & CO. INC. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ponpipom, Mitree M. 431 Brookview Court Branchburg New Jersey 08876 / US | 02 /
Shen, Tsung-Ying 935 Minisink Way Westfield New Jersey 07090 / US | 03 /
Bugianesi, Robert L. 195, Colonia Boulevard Colonia New Jersey 07067 / US | [1981/06] | Representative(s) | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/06] | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet REGIMBEAU 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 80401125.2 | 30.07.1980 | [1981/06] | Priority number, date | US19790062586 | 31.07.1979 Original published format: US 62586 | [1981/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0023865 | Date: | 11.02.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0023865 | Date: | 08.04.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07H15/18, C07J31/00, C07H15/14, A61K31/72, A61K39/39, // C07J9/00 | [1981/06] | CPC: |
C07H15/14 (EP,US);
C07C17/093 (EP,US);
C07C29/38 (EP,US);
C07C29/40 (EP,US);
C07H15/18 (EP,US);
C07J17/005 (EP,US);
C07J9/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/093, C07C22/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/06] | Title | German: | Glycolipid-Verbindungen, Verfahren zur Herstellung und Verwendung als immunologisches Adjuvans | [1981/06] | English: | New glycolipid compounds, process for preparation and use as immunological adjuvant | [1981/06] | French: | Composés glycolipidiques, procédé de préparation et utilisation comme adjuvant immunologique | [1981/06] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 23.03.1981 | Examination requested [1981/22] | 04.09.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.06.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1982 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1982/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [P]EP0012083 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [P]EP0007277 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS,vol. 90, no.3,15th January 1979, page 703,no.23588v,Colum- bus, Ohio, U.S.A. J.V.CHABALA et al:"The preparation of 3-cholesteryl 6-(thio-glycosyl)hexyl ethers and their incorporation into liposomes" & CARBOHYDR.RES.1978, 67 (1), 55-63 |