EP0025745 - Process for propagating human hepatitis A virus in in vitro cell culture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/12] | Process for propagating human hepatitis A in vitro cell culture | ||
[1984/28] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 09.08.1990 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/12] | For all designated states MERCK & CO. INC. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Provost, Philip J. 473 Landis Road Harleysville Pennsylvania 19438 / US | 02 /
Giesa, Paula A. 1708 Lincoln Drive East Ambler Pennsylvania 19002 / US | 03 /
Hilleman, Maurice R. 4107 Fields Drive Lafayette Hill Pennsylvania 19444 / US | [1981/12] | Representative(s) | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet REGIMBEAU 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1981/12] | Corre, Jacques Denis Paul Cabinet Regimbeau 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 80401258.1 | 03.09.1980 | [1981/12] | Priority number, date | US19790071648 | 04.09.1979 Original published format: US 71648 | [1981/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0025745 | Date: | 25.03.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0025745 | Date: | 11.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C12N7/08 | [1981/12] | CPC: |
C12N7/00 (EP);
A61K39/12 (EP);
A61K39/29 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61K2039/5254 (EP);
C12N2770/32432 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Vermehren menschlicher Hepatitis-A Viren in einer Zellkultur in vitro | [1984/28] | English: | Process for propagating human hepatitis A virus in in vitro cell culture | [1984/28] | French: | Procédé de propagation du virus d'hépatite A humaine dans une culture de cellules in vitro | [1984/28] |
Former [1981/12] | Verfahren zum Vermehren menschlicher Hepatitis-A in einer Zellkultur in vitro | ||
Former [1981/12] | Process for propagating human hepatitis A in vitro cell culture | ||
Former [1981/12] | Procédé de propagation d'hépatite A humaine dans une culture de cellules in vitro | Examination procedure | 30.07.1981 | Examination requested [1981/40] | 07.12.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.12.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.04.1985
10.05.1985
ADMISSIBLE Flehmig, B., Dr. Horemer 21 D-7400 Tübingen / DE Opponent's representative Grussdorf, Jürgen Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.04.1985
10.05.1985
ADMISSIBLE Flehmig, B., Dr. Horemer 21 D-7400 Tübingen / DE Opponent's representative Grussdorf, Jürgen, Dr. Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Rubensstrasse 30 D-67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [1985/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.04.1985
Flehmig, B., Dr. Horemer 21 D-7400 Tübingen / DE Opponent's representative Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Zweibrückenstrasse 15 D-80331 München / DE | 25.06.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 31.10.1985 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.05.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1986 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 15.02.1989 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 09.03.1990 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1990/39] | Appeal following opposition | 13.04.1989 | Appeal received No. T0261/89 | 19.06.1989 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.03.1990 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 09.03.1990 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.03.1990 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.09.1984 | [2015/21] |
Former [1999/52] | CH | 11.07.1984 | |
LI | 11.07.1984 | ||
LU | 30.09.1984 | ||
Former [1991/09] | CH | 11.07.1984 | |
LI | 11.07.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | GB811411 [ ] (PARKE DAVIS & CO); | GB878704 [ ] (ALLIED LAB INC); | US3871954 [ ] (ZUCKERMAN ARIE JEREMY); | US3935066 [ ] (APOSTOLOV KOSTADIN); | FR2398504 [ ] (TOURS INST VIROLOGIE [FR]); | US4164566 [ ] (HILLEMAN MAURICE R [US], et al); | EP0008559 [ ] (MERCK & CO INC [US]) | by applicant | US4029764 | US4164566 |