EP0025393 - Device for fixing a spring on a spacer grid of nuclear fuel elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1985 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.1985 [1985/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE Etablissement de Caractère Scientifique Technique et Industriel B.P. 510 75752 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/11] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE Etablissement de Caractère Scientifique Technique et Industriel B.P. 510 F-75752 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feutrel, Claude 105, Grande Rue F-91430 Vauhallan / FR | [1981/11] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1981/11] | Application number, filing date | 80401259.9 | 03.09.1980 | [1981/11] | Priority number, date | FR19790022311 | 06.09.1979 Original published format: FR 7922311 | [1981/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0025393 | Date: | 18.03.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0025393 | Date: | 04.07.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G21C3/34 | [1981/11] | CPC: |
G21C3/3566 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [1981/11] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Befestigen einer Feder auf dem Abstandshaltegitter für Kernbrennelemente | [1981/11] | English: | Device for fixing a spring on a spacer grid of nuclear fuel elements | [1981/11] | French: | Dispositif de fixation d'un ressort sur une grille d'espacement d'éléments combustibles de réacteurs nucléaires | [1981/11] | Examination procedure | 20.08.1981 | Examination requested [1981/43] | 07.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.07.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.12.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2397042 [ ] (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) |