EP0027067 - Planar bifilar antenna with transversal radiation and its use in radar aerials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.1985 [1985/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1982/21] |
Former [1981/15] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rannou, Jean "THOMSON-CSF" - SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1981/15] | Representative(s) | Benoit, Monique, et al Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/33] | Benoit, Monique, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1981/15] | Eisenbeth, Jacques Pierre THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | Application number, filing date | 80401320.9 | 16.09.1980 | [1981/15] | Priority number, date | FR19790024897 | 05.10.1979 Original published format: FR 7924897 | [1981/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0027067 | Date: | 15.04.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0027067 | Date: | 18.07.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q11/04, H01Q1/38 | [1981/15] | CPC: |
H01Q11/04 (EP);
H01Q13/206 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1981/15] | Title | German: | Aus zwei Leitern gebildete Flachantenne mit transversaler Strahlung und ihre Verwendung als Radarantenne | [1981/15] | English: | Planar bifilar antenna with transversal radiation and its use in radar aerials | [1981/15] | French: | Antenne plane bifilaire à rayonnement transversal et son application aux aériens radars | [1981/15] | Examination procedure | 11.05.1981 | Examination requested [1981/30] | 02.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.01.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2198281 [ ]; | GB965802 [ ]; | US3249946 [ ]; | US3231894 [ ]; | FR1331664 [ ]; | US3013268 [ ]; | US3530486 [ ] |