EP0028548 - Real-time optical correlation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.11.1982 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1982/21] |
Former [1981/19] | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huignard, Jean-Pierre "THOMSON-CSF" SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 02 /
Herriau, Jean-Pierre "THOMSON-CSF" SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 03 /
Pichon, Laurence "THOMSON-CSF" SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75360 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1981/19] | Representative(s) | Wang, Pierre, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann 75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/19] | Wang, Pierre, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | Application number, filing date | 80401397.7 | 02.10.1980 | [1981/19] | Priority number, date | FR19790027218 | 05.11.1979 Original published format: FR 7927218 | [1981/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0028548 | Date: | 13.05.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G06G9/00 | [1981/19] | CPC: |
G06E3/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL, SE [1981/19] | Title | German: | Optisches Realzeit-Korrelationssystem | [1981/19] | English: | Real-time optical correlation system | [1981/19] | French: | Système de correlation optique en temps réel | [1981/19] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 23.05.1981 | Examination requested [1981/32] | 23.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1983/01] | 29.09.1982 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1983/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2362466 [ ] (THOMSON CSF [FR]) | [ ] - APPLIED OPTICS, Vol. 14, No. 11, novembre 1975, New York, US, NISENSON et SPRAGLIE: "Real-time optical correlation"pages 2602-2606 | [ ] - OPTICS LETTERS, Vol. 4, No. 4, avril 1979, New York, US, LEE et al.: Dual-axis joint-Fourier-transform correlator"pages 121-123 | [ ] - APPLIED OPTICS, Vol. 9, Juillet 1970, New York, US, WEAVER et al.: "The Optical Convolution of Time Functions"pages 1672-1688 |