EP0028172 - Anticolibacillary animal vaccine, preparation, application and used escherichia coli strains [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.1984 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.10.1984 [1984/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Etablissement public dit: INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE AGRONOMIQUE 149, rue de Grenelle F-75341 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/18] | For all designated states Etablissement public dit: INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE AGRONOMIQUE 149, rue de Grenelle F-75341 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gouet, Philippe Laschamps-St-Genès Champanelle F-63110 Beaumont / FR | 02 /
Contrepois, Michel, Gilbert 55, Hameau de Laniraud Blanzat F-63100 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | 03 /
Dubourguier, Henri-Charles 22, rue des 3 Résistants F-63100 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | 04 /
Girardeau, Jean-Pierre 8 Avenue Jean Moulin F-63540 Romagnat / FR | 05 /
Goby, Jean-François décédé / FR | [1983/36] |
Former [1981/18] | 01 /
Gouet, Philippe Laschamps-St-Genès Champanelle F-63110 Beaumont / FR | ||
02 /
Contrepois, Michel Gilbert 55, Hameau de Laniraud Blanzat F-63100 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | |||
03 /
Dubourguier, Henri-Charles 22, rue des 3 Résistants F-63100 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | |||
04 /
Girardeau, Jean-Pierre 8 Avenue Jean Moulin F-63540 Romagnat / FR | |||
05 /
Goby, Jean-François décédé / FR | Representative(s) | Phélip, Bruno, et al Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/18] | Phélip, Bruno, et al c/o Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 21, rue de La Rochefoucauld F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 80401402.5 | 03.10.1980 | [1981/18] | Priority number, date | FR19790024665 | 03.10.1979 Original published format: FR 7924665 | [1981/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0028172 | Date: | 06.05.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0028172 | Date: | 10.06.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0028172 | Date: | 07.09.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/108 | [1981/18] | CPC: |
A61K39/0258 (EP,US);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,US);
A61K2039/552 (EP,US);
C12R2001/19 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1981/18] | Title | German: | Tierimpfstoff gegen den Kolibazillus, Herstellung, Verwendung und verwendete Escherichia-Kolistämme | [1981/18] | English: | Anticolibacillary animal vaccine, preparation, application and used escherichia coli strains | [1981/18] | French: | Vaccin animal anticolibacillaire, obtention, application et souches d'escherichia coli utilisées | [1981/18] | Examination procedure | 20.10.1981 | Examination requested [1981/52] | 05.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.01.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2347932 (UNILEVER NV [NL]); | US3907987 [ ] (WILSON MICHAEL R); | FR2282908 [ ] (CANADIAN PATENTS DEV [CA]); | [A]EP0003692 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [A]FR2208648 (RIT RECH IND THERAPEUT [BE]); | [A]FR2119903 (UNILEVER NV [NL]) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 76, No. 13 27-03-1972, page 261, ref.: 70908v Columbus, Ohio, US C.M. CAMERON et al.: "Immune response to dead and live Escherichia coli vaccines and colostral transfer of immunity to calves and lambs" & Onderstepoort J. Vet. Res. 1970, 37(3), 157-63 | [ ] - UNLISTED DRUGS, Vol. 21, No. 12, Decembre 1969, page 189, Ref. e, "Porcovac" Vet Rec 85:II, 6 sep. 69 (advt.). | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 87, No. 5 01-08-1977, page 19, ref.: 33523x Columbus, Ohio, US J. KRAJC: "Evaluation of some therapeutic and prophylactic measures for diarrhea control in calves" & Veterinarstvi 1977, 27(1), 20-2 | Examination | - UNLISTED DRUGS, vol. 21, no. 12, décembre 1969, page 189, réf. 2, "Porcovac" Vet Rec 85: II, 6 sep. 69 (advt.) | by applicant | - S.D. ACRES ET AL., "Immunization of Calves Against Enterotoxigenic Colibacillosis by Vaccinating Dams with Purified K99 Antigen and Whole Cell Bacterins", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (197907), vol. 25, no. 1, pages 121 - 126 | - M.R. WILSON, "Immunity to E. coli in pigs ; efficiency of a liveformalized vaccine under field conditions", BRIT. VET. J, (1974), vol. 130, page 599 | - I.ØRSKOV ET AL., "he establishment of K99, à thermolabile transmissibleE. coli K antigen, previously called "Kco" possessed by calf and lambs enteropathogenic strains", ACTA.PART. MICROBIOL. SCAND. SECT., (1975), vol. B 83, pages 31 - 36 | - P À M GUINEE; J. VELDKAMP; W.H. JANSEN, "Improved Minca medium for the detection of K99 antigenin calf enterotoxigenic.strains.of E. coli", INF. & IMMUNITY, (1977), vol. 15, no. 2, pages 676 - 678 | - J.A. MORRIS; A.E. STEVENS; W.J. SOJKA, "Preliminary characterization of cell free.K99 antigen isolated from E.coli B 41", J. OF GEN. MICROBIOL., (1977), vol. 99, pages 353 - 357 | - L.L. MYERS, "Vaccination of cows.with ah E.coli bacterin for theprevention of naturallyoccuring diarrhéal disease intheir calves", AM. J. OF VET. RES, (1976), vol. 37, no. 7, page 831 | - W.J. SOJKA; C. WRAY; J.A. MORRIS, "Passive protection of lambs against experimental enteric colibacillosis by colostral transfer of antibodies from K99 vaccinated ewes", J. MED. MICROBIOL., (1978), vol. 11, page 493 | - POUR LA SCIENCE, (1978), no. 5 | - ACTA.PATH.MICROBIOL.SCAND.SECT. B, (1975), vol. 83, pages 31 - 36 |