EP0032324 - Method of controlling the gain of circuits amplifying the signals produced by a read head associated with a record carrier, and device for carrying it out [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE INTERNATIONALE POUR L'INFORMATIQUE CII - HONEYWELL BULL (dite CII-HB) 94, avenue Gambetta 75020 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/29] | For all designated states COMPAGNIE INTERNATIONALE POUR L'INFORMATIQUE CII - HONEYWELL BULL (dite CII-HB) 94, avenue Gambetta F-75020 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lequien, Jean 94, avenue Gambetta F-75020 - Paris / FR | [1981/29] | Representative(s) | Gouesmel, Daniel BULL S.A., Tour BULL Cédex 74, PC/TB2803 F-92039 Paris La Défense / FR | [1981/29] | Application number, filing date | 80401421.5 | 06.10.1980 | [1981/29] | Priority number, date | FR19790031080 | 19.12.1979 Original published format: FR 7931080 | [1981/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0032324 | Date: | 22.07.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0032324 | Date: | 10.11.1982 | Language: | FR | [1982/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/45, H03G3/20 | [1981/29] | CPC: |
G11B5/035 (EP,US);
H03G3/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1981/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verstärkungsregelung von Schaltungsanordnungen zum Verstärken von Signalen, die von einem Lesekopf abgegeben werden, der mit einem Informations-Aufzeichnungsträger gekoppelt ist, und Vorrichtung zur Ausführung des Verfahrens | [1981/29] | English: | Method of controlling the gain of circuits amplifying the signals produced by a read head associated with a record carrier, and device for carrying it out | [1981/29] | French: | Procédé pour commander le gain des circuits amplifiant les signaux délivrés par une tête de lecture associée à un support d'informations et dispositif pour le mettre en oeuvre | [1981/29] | Examination procedure | 07.07.1981 | Examination requested [1981/38] | 26.04.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.05.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3660821 [ ] (WEBER GUNTER R, et al); | US3879674 [ ] (DRAGON THOMAS J); | [A]FR2424668 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]); | [A]FR1340204 (IBM) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 21, no. 9, février 1979 New York US J. LEWKOWICZ et al.: "Automatic gain control with equalizer", pages 3569-3570 | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 11, no. 2, juillet 1968, New York US F.A. HELLWARTH et al.: "Automatic measure and hold level control" pages 163-164 |