EP0027091 - Display case [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.02.1985 [1985/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMBADAC Quartier Berlanne F-64160 Morlaas / FR | [1981/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bidegain, Georgy Chemin des Crêtes Serres-Castet F-64160 Morlaas / FR | [1981/15] | Representative(s) | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 12, Avenue de la Grande-Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/15] | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 95 Boulevard Beaumarchais F-75003 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 80401436.3 | 08.10.1980 | [1981/15] | Priority number, date | FR19790024942 | 08.10.1979 Original published format: FR 7924942 | [1981/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0027091 | Date: | 15.04.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0027091 | Date: | 01.02.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B65D43/16 | [1981/15] | CPC: |
B65D43/164 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [1981/15] | Title | German: | Schaupackung | [1984/05] | English: | Display case | [1981/15] | French: | Coffret-présentoir | [1981/15] |
Former [1981/15] | Schaukasten | Examination procedure | 11.05.1981 | Examination requested [1981/33] | 28.06.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.07.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR762346 [ ] (ETS NUYTS FRERES); | US2867348 [ ] (MORRISON CHARLES C); | FR1142823 [ ] (MOREL); | DE2208544 [ ]; | FR718765 [ ]; | US2491264 [ ] (LOUIS HERMANI); | FR1028576 [ ] (G B BERRUTI & CO); | US1722013 [ ] (OPPENHEIM JR CHARLES J); | FR1149620 [ ]; | US2880858 [ ] (PERSKY ROBERT O) |