EP0033814 - Electrical connector including surge protection for a plurality of circuits and method of making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.1983 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BENDIX CORPORATION Executive Offices Bendix Center Southfield Michigan 48037 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/33] | For all designated states THE BENDIX CORPORATION Executive Offices Bendix Center Southfield Michigan 48037 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kearney, Hugh Andrew RD 2-BOX 291 Bainbridge New York 13733 / US | 02 /
Wilson, Linnea E. RD 2 Box 249-2 Unadilla New York 13849 / US | [1981/33] | Representative(s) | Maguet, André, et al Service Brevets Bendix 44, Rue François 1er 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/33] | Maguet, André, et al Service Brevets Bendix 44, Rue François 1er F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 80401536.0 | 29.10.1980 | [1981/33] | Priority number, date | US19790104484 | 17.12.1979 Original published format: US 104484 | [1981/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0033814 | Date: | 19.08.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0033814 | Date: | 09.09.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/658 | [1981/33] | CPC: |
H01R13/6666 (EP);
H01R13/713 (EP);
H01T4/08 (EP);
H01R31/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1981/33] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Verbinder mit Schutz gegen Überspannung für mehrere Schaltkreise und dessen Herstellungsverfahren | [1981/33] | English: | Electrical connector including surge protection for a plurality of circuits and method of making same | [1981/33] | French: | Connecteur électrique incluant la protection contre un excès de tension pour plusieurs circuits, et sa méthode de fabrication | [1981/33] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 18.11.1980 | Examination requested [1981/33] | 13.07.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 13.06.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1983/47] | 24.08.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3992652 ; | [AD]US3790858 ; | [AD]US3626237 ; | [AD]US3702420 |