EP0028971 - Linear-displacement transducer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A." 2 Boulevard Victor F-75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/20] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A." 2 Boulevard Victor F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dron, Sylvain Maurice 20, avenue Hector Berlioz F-78530 Buc / FR | [1981/20] | Representative(s) | Moinat, François, et al S.N.E.C.M.A. Service des Brevets Boîte Postale 81 91003 Evry Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/20] | Moinat, François, et al S.N.E.C.M.A. Service des Brevets Boîte Postale 81 F-91003 Evry Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 80401564.2 | 03.11.1980 | [1981/20] | Priority number, date | FR19790027620 | 05.11.1979 Original published format: FR 7927620 | [1981/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0028971 | Date: | 20.05.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0028971 | Date: | 23.03.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/22, G01D5/20 | [1981/20] | CPC: |
G01D5/2258 (EP,US);
G01D5/2046 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1981/20] | Title | German: | Linearer Stellungsgeber | [1981/20] | English: | Linear-displacement transducer | [1981/20] | French: | Capteur de déplacement linéaire | [1981/20] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 06.11.1980 | Examination requested [1981/20] | 17.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.09.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2985854 [ ] (AMMON BROSH); | US3017590 [ ] (JACOB CHASS); | US3054976 [ ] (JOSEPH LIPSHUTZ); | US3181055 [ ] (BISCHOF WALTER J) |