EP0030175 - Toe binding for ski [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/23] | Front cheek for ski binding | ||
[1984/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.1985 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.1985 [1985/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sté. Look Société Anonyme B. P. 72 Rue de la Pique 58004 Nevers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/23] | For all designated states Sté. Look Société Anonyme B. P. 72 Rue de la Pique F-58004 Nevers Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andrieu, Louis 1, Square des Abbés F-58130 Guerigny / FR | 02 /
Bernard, Jean Bât. 1, Résidence "Les Eduens" F-58000 Nevers / FR | 03 /
Beyl, Jean 10, Bd Victor Hugo F-58000 Nevers / FR | 04 /
Le Faou, Daniel 7, Impasse Flaubert Coulanges Les Nevers F-58640 Varennes Vauzelles / FR | 05 /
Peyre, Henri 88, avenue Colbert F-58000 Nevers / FR | 06 /
Veniat, Jacky 83, rue P.V. Couturier F-58000 Nevers / FR | [1981/23] | Representative(s) | Tony-Durand, Serge Cabinet Tony-Durand 77, rue Boissière F-75116 Paris / FR | [1981/23] | Application number, filing date | 80401594.9 | 07.11.1980 | [1981/23] | Priority number, date | FR19790027894 | 13.11.1979 Original published format: FR 7927894 | [1981/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0030175 | Date: | 10.06.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0030175 | Date: | 17.10.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A63C9/085 | [1981/23] | CPC: |
A63C9/001 (EP,US);
A63C9/08514 (EP,US);
A63C9/08521 (EP,US);
A63C9/0855 (EP,US);
A63C9/08564 (EP,US);
A63C9/08571 (EP,US);
A63C9/08578 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, IT, LI [1981/23] | Title | German: | Vorderbacken für Skibindung | [1981/23] | English: | Toe binding for ski | [1984/42] | French: | Butée avant de fixation de ski | [1981/23] |
Former [1981/23] | Front cheek for ski binding | Examination procedure | 08.10.1981 | Examination requested [1981/50] | 03.02.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.04.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2314742 [ ] (SALOMON & FILS F [FR]); | FR2373305 [ ] (SALOMON & FILS F [FR]); | FR2385418 [ ] (SALOMON & FILS F [FR], et al); | FR2418656 [ ] (BEYL JEAN JOSEPH ALFRED [FR]); | DE2916348 [ ] (SALOMON & FILS F) | Examination | EP0025747 |