EP0026724 - Connecting device for two mobile carriages guided on parallel rails [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 04.05.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LECTRA SYSTEMES S.A. 12, chemin de Tillon 33140 Villenave d'Ornon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/14] | For all designated states LECTRA SYSTEMES S.A. 12, chemin de Tillon F-33140 Villenave d'Ornon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Etcheparre, Jean 367, avenue de Verdun F-33700 Merignac / FR | 02 /
Etcheparre, Bernard 367, avenue de Verdun F-33700 Merignac / FR | [1981/14] | Representative(s) | Trolliet, Jean-Claude Cabinet BURDIPAT 20, cours du Chapeau Rouge 33000 Bordeaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/14] | Trolliet, Jean-Claude Cabinet BURDIPAT 20, cours du Chapeau Rouge F-33000 Bordeaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 80450004.9 | 25.09.1980 | [1981/14] | Priority number, date | FR19790024459 | 26.09.1979 Original published format: FR 7924459 | [1981/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0026724 | Date: | 08.04.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0026724 | Date: | 25.01.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q1/26, B66C11/16 | [1981/14] | CPC: |
B66C11/16 (EP,US);
B23Q1/267 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/14] | Title | German: | Verbindungsvorrichtung für zwei durch parallele Schienen geführte mobile Schlitten | [1981/14] | English: | Connecting device for two mobile carriages guided on parallel rails | [1981/14] | French: | Dispositif d'interconnexion de deux chariots mobiles guidés par des rails parallèles | [1981/14] | Examination procedure | 08.10.1981 | Examination requested [1981/50] | 14.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.07.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 26.02.1986 | Appeal received No. T0071/86 | 18.01.1988 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | Opposition(s) | 31.03.1988 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1988/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 25.01.1984 | LU | 30.09.1984 | AT | 25.09.1986 | SE | 26.09.1987 | BE | 30.09.1987 | CH | 30.09.1987 | LI | 30.09.1987 | [1999/52] |
Former [1991/51] | NL | 25.01.1984 | |
AT | 25.09.1986 | ||
SE | 26.09.1987 | ||
BE | 30.09.1987 | ||
CH | 30.09.1987 | ||
LI | 30.09.1987 | ||
Former [1989/26] | NL | 25.01.1984 | |
AT | 25.09.1986 | ||
SE | 26.09.1987 | ||
CH | 30.09.1987 | ||
LI | 30.09.1987 | ||
Former [1989/19] | NL | 25.01.1984 | |
AT | 25.09.1986 | ||
SE | 26.09.1987 | ||
Former [1989/08] | NL | 25.01.1984 | |
AT | 25.09.1986 | ||
Former [1985/23] | NL | 25.01.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE116658 ; | [A]DE853949 (LUDOWICI WILHELM DR-ING); | [A]US2743024 (SCHMITT OTTO H, et al); | [A]DE1007485 (KRUPP ARDELT GMBH) |