EP0024250 - Process and plant for the recovery of carbon-rich waste products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.1981 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARBED S.A. Avenue de la Liberté 19 L-2930 Luxembourg / LU | [1981/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Metz, Paul 18 Rue J.P.Brasseur Luxemburg / LU | 02 /
Weiner, Antoine 104, Rue de Luxembourg Esch/Alzette / LU | [1981/08] | Representative(s) | Neyen, René ARBED-Recherches Service de la Propriété Industrielle route de Luxembourg 66 L-4221 Esch-sur-Alzette / LU | [1981/08] | Application number, filing date | 80630011.7 | 28.04.1980 | [1981/08] | Priority number, date | LU19790081606 | 14.08.1979 Original published format: LU 81606 | [1981/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0024250 | Date: | 25.02.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B29H19/00, C10J3/08, C10B53/00 | [1981/08] | CPC: |
C10B49/14 (EP);
C10B53/00 (EP);
C10B53/07 (EP);
C10J3/57 (EP);
C10J2300/0946 (EP);
C10J2300/0956 (EP);
C10J2300/0959 (EP);
C10J2300/0996 (EP);
C21C2005/4666 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1981/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Wiederverwertung kohlenstoffreicher Abfälle | [1981/08] | English: | Process and plant for the recovery of carbon-rich waste products | [1981/08] | French: | Procédé et installation de revalorisation de produits de déchets riches en carbone | [1981/08] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 12.08.1981 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1981/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2520584 [ ] (MAXIMILIANSHUETTE EISENWERK); | DE1955115 [ ] (BLACK SIVALLS & BRYSON INC); | US4187672 [ ] (RASOR NED S [US]); | FR2310401 [ ] (MAXIMILIANSHUETTE EISENWERK [DE]); | DE2620454 [ ] (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG); | DE2750725 [ ] (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG); | DE1915248 [ ] (BLACK SIVALLS & BRYSON INC); | DE2304369 [ ]; | DE2219227 [ ] (SCHMID OTTO) |