EP0023894 - Forming press for making perimetral bends on metal sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SALVAGNINI TRANSFERICA S.p.A. Strada della Favorita I-36040 Sarego (Vicenza) / IT | [1981/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Salvagnini, Guido Largo De Gasperi 11/13 I-36071 Arzignano (Vicenza) / IT | [1981/06] | Representative(s) | Perani, Aurelio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Visconti di Modrone, 7 I-20122 Milano / IT | [2008/38] |
Former [1981/06] | Perani, Aurelio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Visconti di Modrone, 7 I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 80830060.2 | 30.07.1980 | [1981/06] | Priority number, date | IT19790024895 | 02.08.1979 Original published format: IT 2489579 | [1981/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0023894 | Date: | 11.02.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0023894 | Date: | 05.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B21D5/04 | [1981/06] | CPC: |
B21D5/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/06] | Title | German: | Abkantpresse zum Herstellen von Krümmungen am Rand von Blechen | [1981/06] | English: | Forming press for making perimetral bends on metal sheets | [1981/06] | French: | Presse à plier pour la réalisation de plis à la périphérie de tôles | [1981/06] | Examination procedure | 06.05.1981 | Examination requested [1981/28] | 30.11.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.02.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 06.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 05.10.1983 | NL | 05.10.1983 | [1984/28] |
Former [1984/21] | BE | 05.10.1983 | Documents cited: | Search | DE584362 [ ] (HILTMANN & LORENZ AKT GES MASC); | GB1075663 [ ] (BRITISH FED WELDER & MACHINE C); | DE2301089 [ ] (PRODUCTION TOOLS OXFORD LTD); | US4002049 [ ] (RANDOLPH SR ALLAN EMERSON); | DE2839978 [ ] (SALVAGNINI TRANSFERICA SPA) |