EP0032654 - Machine to wash surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.1984 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOVUM - Novità in Elettrodomestica Srl Corso Cavour, 2/2E I-34132 Trieste / IT | [1981/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parisi, Sebastiano Borgo Vittorio, 43 Roma / IT | [1981/30] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1983/43] |
Former [1981/30] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 I-33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 80830109.7 | 18.12.1980 | [1981/30] | Priority number, date | IT19800083305 | 14.01.1980 Original published format: IT 8330580 | [1981/30] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0032654 | Date: | 29.07.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0032654 | Date: | 05.08.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A47L11/34, A47L11/30 | [1981/30] | CPC: |
A47L11/4069 (EP,US);
A47L11/30 (EP,US);
A47L11/34 (EP,US);
A47L11/4036 (EP,US);
A47L11/4041 (EP,US);
A47L11/4044 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1981/30] | Title | German: | Flächenwaschgerät | [1981/30] | English: | Machine to wash surfaces | [1981/30] | French: | Machine à laver des surfaces | [1981/30] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 21.12.1981 | Examination requested [1982/09] | 15.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/25] | 27.10.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1984/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3699607 (PUTT FRANK E); | DE2206281 [ ] (LOEOECK WILLI); | [A]FR2331991 (JAHRLING KLAUS [DE]); | [A]DE2615501 (WENDNER WILHELM); | DE2756672 [ ] (KENNGOTT ROLF); | US4167799 [ ] (WEBB CHARLES F); | [P]EP0017519 (BEGARIE AUGUSTE) |