EP0022117 - Metoclopramid resinate and medicament containing it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.1982 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.1983 [1983/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trenker, Ady 478, Avenue Dolez B-1180 Bruxelles / BE | [1981/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1981/01] | Representative(s) | de Kemmeter, François, et al Cabinet Bede Boulevard Général Wahis 15 1030 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/01] | de Kemmeter, François, et al Cabinet Bede Place de l'Alma, 3 B-1200 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 80870032.2 | 05.06.1980 | [1981/01] | Priority number, date | BE19790195638 | 08.06.1979 Original published format: BE 195638 | [1981/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0022117 | Date: | 07.01.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0022117 | Date: | 11.11.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/165, A61K9/18, C07C103/76, A61K31/795 | [1981/44] | CPC: |
A61K31/166 (EP);
A61K47/585 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1981/01] | A61K31/165, A61K9/18, C07C103/76 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1981/01] | Title | German: | Metoclopramidresinat und Arzneimittel, das ein solches Resinat enthält | [1981/01] | English: | Metoclopramid resinate and medicament containing it | [1981/01] | French: | Résinate de metoclopramide et médicament le contenant | [1981/01] | File destroyed: | 19.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 06.08.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1983/03] | 18.10.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2004105 ; | [X]FR2150931 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 89, No. 14, 2 Octobre 1978, page 552, abrege 117961t, Columbus, Ohio (US) J. JARZEBINSKY et al.: "Use of synthetic ion exchange resins for determining the active substance in pharmaceutical preparations. Part XIX: Complexometric determination of amines in some simple drugs" & Farm. Pol. 1978, 34(4)237-9 | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 83, No. 14, 6 Octobre 1975, page 427, abrege 120770m, Columbus, Ohio (US) R. SHEKERDZHIISKI et al.: "Antiemetic preparation in tablet form with depot action based on prolonged diffusion" & Farmatsiya (Sofia) 1974, 24(4)11-16 (Bulg.) |