EP0024270 - Heat-sealable packaging film presenting a peelable joint, process for its preparation, and packaging materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 08.02.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states U C B, S.A. 4, Chaussée de Charleroi B-1060 Bruxelles / BE | [1981/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bontinck, Walter 30, Engelhoekstraat B-9852 Sint-Martens-Leerne / BE | 02 /
D'Hondt, Marc 210(d), Heirweg-Oudenaerde B-9730 Nazareth / BE | 03 /
Jacobs, Roland 39, Schoorstraat B-9200 Wetteren / BE | [1981/08] | Representative(s) | Dusseldorp, Raymond, et al UCB S.A. Intellectual Property Department Allée de la Recherche 60 1070 Brussel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/11] | Dusseldorp, Raymond, et al UCB S.A. Département D.T.B. 33, rue d'Anderlecht B-1620 Drogenbos / BE | ||
Former [1981/08] | Vanderborght, Henri U C B, S.A. Département D.T.B. 33, rue d'Anderlecht B-1620 Drogenbos / BE | Application number, filing date | 80870038.9 | 06.08.1980 | [1981/08] | Priority number, date | GB19790027646 | 08.08.1979 Original published format: GB 7927646 | [1981/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0024270 | Date: | 25.02.1981 | Language: | FR | [1981/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0024270 | Date: | 10.10.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, C08L23/06 | [1981/08] | CPC: |
C08J7/123 (EP,US);
C08L23/06 (EP,US);
C08L23/0853 (EP,US);
C08J2323/04 (EP,US);
C08L2205/03 (EP,US);
C08L25/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/04, C08L25/06 (EP,US);
C08L23/06, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L23/06, C08L2666/06 (US,EP);
C08L23/0853, C08L2666/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/08] | Title | German: | Heissiegelbare Verpackungsfolie mit aufreissbarer Verbindung, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und Verpackungen | [1981/08] | English: | Heat-sealable packaging film presenting a peelable joint, process for its preparation, and packaging materials | [1981/08] | French: | Film d'emballage thermoscellable à joint pelable, son procédé de préparation et emballages | [1981/08] | Examination procedure | 04.07.1981 | Examination requested [1981/38] | 22.01.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.02.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.04.1985
24.05.1985
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.04.1985
24.05.1985
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 23.08.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.12.1985 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.01.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 21.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 10.09.1987 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 20.09.1987 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1988/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.08.1985 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | BE657210 [ ]; | FR2012460 [ ] (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | FR2137984 [ ] (UCB SA); | FR2233163 [ ] (BAKELITE XYLONITE LTD [GB]) |