EP0025427 - Process and apparatus for converting dissolution water containing or hydrated metal chlorides into metal oxides, thereby producing hydrochloric acid of 30-33 per cent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.10.1982 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ruthner Industrieanlagen-Aktiengesellschaft Aichholzgasse 51-53 A-1121 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1981/11] | For all designated states Ruthner Industrieanlagen-Aktiengesellschaft Aichholzgasse 51-53 A-1121 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Samhaber, Friedrich, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Schieferhub 5 A-4722 Peuerbach / AT | [1981/11] | Representative(s) | Köhler-Pavlik, Johann Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1981/11] | Köhler-Pavlik, Johann, Dipl.-Ing. Margaretenplatz 5 A-1050 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 80890095.5 | 01.09.1980 | [1981/11] | Priority number, date | AT19790005882 | 06.09.1979 Original published format: AT 588279 | [1981/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0025427 | Date: | 18.03.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C01B13/32, C01B7/03 | [1981/11] | CPC: |
C01B7/035 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1981/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Umwandlung von lösungs- oder kristallwasserhaltigen Metallchloriden in Metalloxyde unter Gewinnung von 30-33%iger Salzsäure | [1981/11] | English: | Process and apparatus for converting dissolution water containing or hydrated metal chlorides into metal oxides, thereby producing hydrochloric acid of 30-33 per cent | [1981/11] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la transformation de chlorures de métaux contenant de l'eau de dissolution ou hydratés en oxydes de métaux tout en produisant de l'acide chlorhydrique à 30-33 pour cent | [1981/11] | File destroyed: | 19.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 06.06.1981 | Examination requested [1981/34] | 01.12.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1982/52] | 16.09.1982 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1982/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1102712 [ ]; | AT284062B [ ] (RUTHNER IND PLANUNGS AG); | DE1667724 [ ] (SUED CHEMIE AG); | DE2254346 [ ] (RUTHNER IND PLANUNGS AG); | DE2532022 [ ] (DEAD SEA WORKS LTD) |