EP0023212 - AIR COOLED DOOR HANDLE FOR HEATERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.07.1983 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMOKY MOUNTAIN ENTERPRISES, INC. 872 Riverside Drive Asheville, NC 28804 / US | [1981/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCKNER, Carrol F. 15 Pine Acre Boulevard Asheville, NC 28804 / US | 02 /
COOK, Clarence Glenn 101 A Manor Ridge Apts. Asheville, NC 28804 / US | 03 /
KANE, Thomas J. 287 Beaverdam Road Asheville, NC 28804 / US | [1981/05] | Representative(s) | Fincke, Karl Theodor, et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/07] | Fincke, Karl Theodor, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | ||
Former [1981/05] | Fincke, Karl Theodor, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 80900218.1 | 03.01.1980 | [1981/05] | WO1980US00005 | Priority number, date | US19790000943 | 04.01.1979 Original published format: US 943 | [1981/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8001408 | Date: | 10.07.1980 | [1980/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0023212 | Date: | 04.02.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.1980 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1981 | Classification | IPC: | F24C1/14, A47B95/02, E05C3/04, F16B9/00 | [1981/05] | CPC: |
F24B1/191 (EP,US);
F24C15/024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1981/05] | Title | German: | MIT LUFT GEKÜHLTE TÜRKLINKE FÜR HEIZUNGEN | [1981/05] | English: | AIR COOLED DOOR HANDLE FOR HEATERS | [1981/05] | French: | POIGNEE DE PORTE REFROIDIE PAR AIR POUR APPAREILS DE CHAUFFAGE | [1981/05] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.1980 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.1980 | Search fee paid | 03.09.1980 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.1981 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.1981 | Examination requested [1981/13] | 27.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1983/37] | 27.05.1983 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1983/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.1983 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | CH137419 [ ] (WEGMANN EDUARD [CH]) | International search | [X]US312940 ; | [X]US373181 ; | [X]US720626 (SCHULTE JOHN A [US]); | [X]US1916848 (NORTH EDWIN W); | [X]US2505312 (WAGNER JOHN J); | [X]US2578230 (DAVIS CARROLL V); | [X]US3409003 (REHBERG THOMAS R, et al) |