EP0028232 - DEVICE FOR IRRIGATION OF PLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.1982 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEIFHEIT INTERNATIONAL GmbH Leifheitstrasse D-5408 Nassau/Lahn / DE | [1981/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÜFER, Dieter Windener Strasse 56 D-5408 Nassau / DE | 02 /
JOSWIG, Siegfried Austrasse 5 D-5241 Kausen / DE | [1981/19] | Application number, filing date | 80900831.1 | 07.05.1980 | [1981/19] | WO1980DE00058 | Priority number, date | DE19792918332 | 07.05.1979 Original published format: DE 2918332 | [1981/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8002359 | Date: | 13.11.1980 | [1980/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0028232 | Date: | 13.05.1981 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.1980 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/19] | Classification | IPC: | A01G27/00 | [1981/19] | CPC: |
A01G27/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1981/19] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR PFLANZENBEWÄSSERUNG | [1981/19] | English: | DEVICE FOR IRRIGATION OF PLANTS | [1981/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR L'IRRIGATION DE PLANTES | [1981/19] | File destroyed: | 19.02.1989 | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.1981 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.1981 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.1981 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.1981 | Examination requested [1981/21] | 30.12.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.1982 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1982/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR1546249 [ ]; | DE934258 [ ]; | CH593603 [ ] |