EP0030534 - COPYING ROUTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.1984 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.1984 [1984/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TREVOR, Terence Aubrey 33 Victoria Street Balmoral, Queensland 4171 / AU | [1981/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1981/25] | Representative(s) | Prüfer, Lutz H. Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/25] | Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys. Harthauser Strasse 25d D-81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 80901056.4 | 10.06.1980 | [1981/25] | WO1980AU00021 | Priority number, date | AU19790009144 | 11.06.1979 Original published format: AU 914479 | AU19800002040 | 17.01.1980 Original published format: AU 204080 | [1981/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8002814 | Date: | 24.12.1980 | [1980/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0030534 | Date: | 24.06.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.1980 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0030534 | Date: | 07.12.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q35/10 | [1981/25] | CPC: |
B23Q35/102 (EP,US);
B23Q35/20 (EP,US);
Y10T409/302576 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1981/25] | Title | German: | KOPIERENDE FRÄSMASCHINE | [1981/25] | English: | COPYING ROUTING MACHINE | [1981/25] | French: | DETOUREUSE COPIEUSE | [1981/25] | File destroyed: | 09.08.1994 | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.1981 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.1981 | Search fee paid | 29.01.1981 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.1981 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.1981 | Examination requested [1981/25] | 22.07.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.05.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | CH481765 [ ] (KARFO JOHN K [US]); | US3570129 [ ] (VECCHIO JOSEPH T DEL) | International search | [X]GB1219260 (DECKEL AG FRIEDRICH [DE]); | [X]AU6037869 ; | [X]US3614910 (BERLANT GEORGE); | [X]GB1336534 (KUHLMANN KG FRANZ) |