EP0030565 - REPLACING PORT STRUCTURE FOR REPLACEABLE COMPONENT IN SHIELD BOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.01.1986 [1986/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Cable, Ltd. 1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | For all designated states DORYOKURO KAKUNENRYO KAIHATSU JIGYODAN 9-13, Akasaka 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1981/25] | For all designated states HITACHI CABLE, LTD. 1-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states DORYOKURO KAKUNENRYO KAIHATSU JIGYODAN 9-13, Akasaka 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNAOSHI, Mitsugu 531, Takaba Katsuta-shi Ibaraki 312 / JP | 02 /
TOKORO, Koichi 791, Kawajiri-cho Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 319-14 / JP | 03 /
NATORI, Takeshi 1059-2, Aza Sakunai Oaza Muramatsu Tokaimura, Naka-gun Ibaraki 319-11 / JP | 04 /
YUKI, Kojiro 8-5, Takasuzu-cho, 1-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 317 / JP | [1981/25] | Representative(s) | Votier, Sidney David, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [1981/25] | Application number, filing date | 80901124.0 | 20.06.1980 | [1981/25] | WO1980JP00139 | Priority number, date | JP19790078582 | 21.06.1979 Original published format: JP 7858279 | [1981/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8002890 | Date: | 24.12.1980 | [1980/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0030565 | Date: | 24.06.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0030565 | Date: | 27.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G21F7/04, B01L1/00, B25J21/02 | [1981/25] | CPC: |
B25J21/02 (EP,US);
G21F7/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1981/25] | Title | German: | DURCHGANGSSTRUKTUR ZUM AUSWECHSELN EINER AUSWECHSELBAREN KOMPONENTE IN EINER ABGESCHIRMTEN ZELLE | [1981/25] | English: | REPLACING PORT STRUCTURE FOR REPLACEABLE COMPONENT IN SHIELD BOX | [1981/25] | French: | STRUCTURE D'ORIFICE DE REMPLACEMENT POUR COMPOSANT CHANGEABLE DANS UNE BOITE DE PROTECTION | [1981/25] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.1980 | Translation filed | 14.11.1980 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.1980 | Search fee paid | 14.11.1980 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.1980 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.1980 | Examination requested [1981/25] | 23.08.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.06.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3051963 [ ] (HALLETT JR GALEN M); | FR1458261 [ ] (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE); | GB1149495 [ ] (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | DE1775082 [ ] (WAELISCHMILLER HANS); | FR2248447 [ ] (CENTRAL RESEARCH LAB INC [US]); | US4010588 [ ] (EISERT GERALD A); | US4141609 [ ] (EISERT GERALD A) | International search | [X]US3475808 (WOOLSEY JOSEPH W); | [X]JPS52121599U ; | [X]US4156146 (IMAI KASHIO [JP], et al) | [X] - Genshiryoku Kogyo, Vol. 18, No. 10 (1972-10) AKUTSU HIDEO and two others, "GLOVE BOX NO HOKI (SONO ICHI)", P. 75-81. | [X] - Genshiryoku Kogyo, Vol. 12, No. 2 (1966-2) MURAKAMI MASATOSHI "KO-HOSHASEI BUSSHITSU TORIATSUKAI GIJUTSU" P. 75-78. |