EP0030539 - Additive for a hardening or air-drying composition, preferably a liquid paint [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/25] | CELLULAR PLASTIC ADDITIVE | ||
[1982/25] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 11.05.1984 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.1984 | Revocation of patent | published on 11.07.1984 [1984/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAN BERGLUND PRODUKTIONS AB Prästbergavägen 41 S-234 00 Lomma / SE | [1981/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGLUND, Jan-Olof Valentin Prästbergavägen 41 S-234 00 Lomma / SE | [1981/25] | Representative(s) | Ström, Tore Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/25] | Ström, Tore Ström & Gulliksson AB Studentgatan 1 P.O. Box 4188 S-203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 80901179.4 | 12.06.1980 | [1981/25] | WO1980SE00167 | Priority number, date | SE19790005380 | 19.06.1979 Original published format: SE 7905380 | [1981/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8002845 | Date: | 24.12.1980 | [1980/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0030539 | Date: | 24.06.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.1980 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0030539 | Date: | 23.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/25] | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/28, C09D7/12, C08K7/22 | [1981/25] | CPC: |
C08L23/06 (EP,US);
C09D5/28 (EP,US);
C09D7/65 (EP,US);
C09D7/70 (EP,US);
C08K7/14 (EP,US);
C08L25/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1981/25] | Title | German: | Zusatzmittel für eine härtende oder lufttrocknende Zusammensetzung, insbesondere für einen flüssigen Anstrich | [1982/25] | English: | Additive for a hardening or air-drying composition, preferably a liquid paint | [1982/25] | French: | Additif pour composition durcissable ou séchable à l'air, en particulier pour peinture liquide | [1982/25] |
Former [1981/25] | ZELLULÄRER KUNSTSTOFFZUSATZ | ||
Former [1981/25] | CELLULAR PLASTIC ADDITIVE | ||
Former [1981/25] | ADDITIF PLASTIQUE CELLULAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 12.02.1981 | National basic fee paid | 12.02.1981 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.02.1981 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.1981 | Examination requested [1981/25] | 06.10.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.11.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.03.1983
06.04.1983
ADMISSIBLE BASF Farben + Fasern AG, Hamburg -geändert in BASF Lacke + Farben AG Münster mit Wirkung vom 3.5.86- X / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.03.1983
06.04.1983
ADMISSIBLE BASF Farben + Fasern AG, Hamburg -geändert in BASF Lacke + Farben AG, Münster mit Wirkung vom 3.5.86- / DE | 29.04.1983 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.11.1983 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.01.1984 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 27.01.1984 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1984/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DK133856 ; | [A]GB908492 (INSUL FIL CO INC); | [A]GB1089542 (ICI LTD); | [A]FR1583135 ; | [A]GB1272260 (BERTHELSEN EVAN BANG [DK], et al); | [A]DE2307380 (CABOT CORP); | [A]SE365529 (DULUX AUSTRALIA LTD); | [A]FR2307855 (LEVIS NV SA [BE]); | [P]DE2928738 (AWIH) |