EP0032503 - LOAD MONITORING SYSTEM WITH MEANS FOR GENERATING TIMING SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.1981 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.1981 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.1981 [1981/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dybel, Frank R. 981 Wingate Road Olympia Fields, Illinois 60461 / US | For all designated states Dybel, William P. 981 Wingate Road Olympia Fields, Illinois 60461 / US | [1981/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1981/30] | Application number, filing date | 80901576.1 | 21.07.1980 | [1981/30] | WO1980US00907 | Priority number, date | US19790059471 | 20.07.1979 Original published format: US 59471 | [1981/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8100298 | Date: | 05.02.1981 | [1981/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0032503 | Date: | 29.07.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/30] | Classification | IPC: | G01B7/16 | [1981/30] | CPC: |
G01B7/16 (EP,US);
G01L1/16 (EP,US);
G01L5/0076 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1981/30] | Title | German: | LADUNGSÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM MIT MITTEL ZUM ERZEUGEN VON TAKTSIGNALEN | [1981/30] | English: | LOAD MONITORING SYSTEM WITH MEANS FOR GENERATING TIMING SIGNALS | [1981/30] | French: | SYSTEME MONITEUR DE CHARGE AVEC MOYENS DE PRODUCTION DE SIGNAUX DE SYNCHRONISATION | [1981/30] | File destroyed: | 19.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 21.05.1981 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1981/45] | 21.07.1981 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1981/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US2644151 [ ] (KRUEGER THEODORE H); | US2924968 [ ] (COLTEN ROBERT B, et al); | US3303694 [ ] (ANTHONY D ONOFRIO) |