EP0034168 - HYDROGEN ANNEALING PROCESS FOR SILICON GATE MEMORY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.1982 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCR CORPORATION World Headquarters Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | [1981/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRUDEL, Murray Lawrence 2024 Meadow Side Lane Centerville, OH 45459 / US | 02 /
DHAM, Vinod Kumar Central Park Apartments, Apt. 92 1055 Manet Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | [1981/34] | Representative(s) | Robinson, Robert George International Intellectual Property Department, NCR Limited, 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/34] | Robinson, Robert George International Patent Department NCR Limited 206 Marylebone Road London NW1 6LY / GB | Application number, filing date | 80901693.4 | 07.08.1980 | [1981/34] | WO1980US01020 | Priority number, date | US19790065806 | 13.08.1979 Original published format: US 65806 | [1981/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8100487 | Date: | 19.02.1981 | [1981/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0034168 | Date: | 26.08.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/324, H01L21/477 | [1981/34] | CPC: |
H01L21/3003 (EP);
H10B41/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1981/34] | Title | German: | WASSERSTOFF-GLÜHVERFAHREN FÜR EINE GATE-SPEICHERVORRICHTUNG AUS SILICIUM | [1981/34] | English: | HYDROGEN ANNEALING PROCESS FOR SILICON GATE MEMORY DEVICE | [1981/34] | French: | PROCEDE DE RECUIT A L'HYDROGENE POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE MEMOIRE DE PORTE AU SILICIUM | [1981/34] | File destroyed: | 19.02.1989 | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.1981 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.1981 | Search fee paid | 19.03.1981 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.1981 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.1981 | Examination requested [1981/39] | 22.06.1982 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1982/38] | 18.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4057821 [ ] (PATEL PRAMODBHAI D); | NL7902247 [ ] (FUJITSU LTD); | DE2911484 [ ] (FUJITSU LTD); | DE2934582 [ ] (HITACHI LTD) | International search | [X]US3615873 (SLUSS JAMES A JR, et al); | [A]US3653978 (ROBINSON DAVID PHYTHIAN, et al); | [A]US3719866 (NABER C, et al); | [A]US3867196 (RICHMAN PAUL); | [A]USRE28386E ; | [A]US4027380 (DEAL BRUCE E, et al); | [X]US4097314 (SCHLESIER KENNETH MANSFIELD, et al); | [X]US4151007 (LEVINSTEIN HYMAN J [US], et al) | [A] - Solid State Electronics, Vol. 13, pp. 1451-1459, published, 1970, "Surface State Related 1/F Noise in MOS Transistors" By HSUS.T. | [X] - J. Electrochem. Soc., Vol. 118, No. 9, pp. 1463-1468, published, September 1971"High-Temperature Annealing Of Oxidized Silicon Surfaces" By MONTILLO et al. | [X] - I.B.M. Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Vol. 18, No. 3 p. 753, published, August 1975"Post Oxidation Annealing of Field-Effect Transistors to Reduce Fixed Charges Levels" By BURKHARDT et al |