EP0044303 - ELECTRIC STORAGE BATTERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.1981 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHLORIDE GROUP PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY 52 Grosvenor Gardens London SW1W 0AU / GB | [1982/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEARSON, Ernest James 134 Manchester Road, Swinton Manchester / GB | [1982/04] | Application number, filing date | 80901855.9 | 08.10.1980 | [1982/04] | WO1980GB00159 | Priority number, date | GB19790034789 | 08.10.1979 Original published format: GB 7934789 | [1982/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8101076 | Date: | 16.04.1981 | [1981/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0044303 | Date: | 27.01.1982 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/04] | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/04 | [1982/04] | CPC: |
H01M10/342 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1982/04] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE AKKUMULATORENBATTERIEN | [1982/04] | English: | ELECTRIC STORAGE BATTERIES | [1982/04] | French: | BATTERIES D'ACCUMULATEURS ELECTRIQUES | [1982/04] | File destroyed: | 19.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 08.09.1981 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1982/07] | 18.11.1981 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR1095834 [ ]; | GB312828 [ ] (HAMBEY SHIMIDZU); | [A]GB224994 (KENNETH ESSEX EDGEWORTH); | [A]US3844841 (BAKER B); | [A]US2906805 (ZAHN HAROLD E) |