EP0036425 - ALTERNATE LIQUID/GASEOUS FUEL OPERATION OF ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.07.1984 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GARRETSON EQUIPMENT CO., INC. P.O. Box 111 Mt. Pleasant, IA 52641 / US | [1981/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARRETSON, Keith Howard Rural Route Salem, IA 52649 / US | [1981/39] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [1981/39] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 80901917.7 | 12.09.1980 | [1981/39] | WO1980US01175 | Priority number, date | US19790081842 | 04.10.1979 Original published format: US 81842 | [1981/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8101033 | Date: | 16.04.1981 | [1981/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0036425 | Date: | 30.09.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F02M21/02 | [1981/39] | CPC: |
F02M13/08 (EP);
F02M35/04 (EP);
F02B3/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1981/39] | Title | German: | WECHSELWEISE BEDIENUNG VON MOTOREN MIT FLÜSSIGEM/GASARTIGEM BRENNSTOFF | [1981/39] | English: | ALTERNATE LIQUID/GASEOUS FUEL OPERATION OF ENGINES | [1981/39] | French: | FONCTIONNEMENT ALTERNATIF DE MOTEURS EN COMBUSTIBLE LIQUIDE/GAZEUX | [1981/39] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.1981 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.1981 | Search fee paid | 10.06.1981 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.1981 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.1981 | Examination requested [1981/51] | 10.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.11.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1984/39] | 16.04.1984 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1984/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2939775 [ ] (MIDDLETON JOHN R L, et al); | FR2243341 [ ] (LANDI DEN HARTOG BV [NL]); | GB1469464 [ ] (LANDI DEN HARTOG BV) | International search | [A]US2927848 (RICHARD BAVERSTOCK); | [A]US2983592 (JONES SAM P); | [A]US3282664 (RICHARD BAVERSTOCK); | [A]US3421483 (FOX CLARENCE D); | [A]US3687119 (HOOGEBOOM ADRIANUS JOHANNES TH); | [A]US3960126 (SHINODA KAZUO); | [A]US4020810 (BAVERSTOCK RICHARD); | [A]US4063905 (JOHNSON ROY HENRY, et al); | [A]US4098248 (TODD WILLIAM L) |