EP0063112 - SILICON CARBIDE BODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.1983 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Kingdom Atomic Energy Authority 11 Charles II Street London SW1Y 4QP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/43] | For all designated states UNITED KINGDOM ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY 11 Charles II Street London SW1Y 4QP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NORTH, Bernard 52 Long Croft Meadow Astley Park Chorley Lancashire / GB | 02 /
KENNEDY, Peter 111 Whittingham Lane Barton Preston / GB | [1982/43] | Application number, filing date | 80901959.9 | 27.10.1980 | [1982/43] | WO1980GB00182 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8201545 | Date: | 13.05.1982 | [1982/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0063112 | Date: | 27.10.1982 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.05.1982 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/43] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/56, C01B31/36 | [1982/43] | CPC: |
C04B35/573 (EP,US);
C01B32/956 (EP,US);
C01B32/97 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP);
C01P2006/10 (EP);
C01P2006/12 (EP);
C01P2006/80 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1982/43] | Title | German: | SILICIUMCARBIDKÖRPER | [1982/43] | English: | SILICON CARBIDE BODIES | [1982/43] | French: | CORPS EN CARBURE DE SILICIUM | [1982/43] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 22.10.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1983/14] | 04.01.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.07.1982 | FR   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4195049 (NOAKES JACK E [US], et al); | US4166841 [ ] (NOAKES JACK E [US], et al); | GB2017667 [ ] (SUZUKI H); | [A]GB1180918 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK [GB]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 88, No. 12, issued 1978, March 20 (Columbus, Ohio, US), see page 249, column 1, the Abstract No. 78029c, SU, A, 585142, 25th December 1977Podmoskovnyi Mining-Chemical Plant |