EP0037418 - SHEAR THICKENING FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.06.1986 [1986/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Exxon Production Research Company P.O. Box 2189 3120 Buffalo Speedway Houston Texas 77001 / US | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390 180 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/41] | For all designated states Exxon Production Research Company P.O. Box 2189 3120 Buffalo Speedway Houston Texas 77001 / US | ||
For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRAKE, Evelyn N. 11 Brook Lane Plainfield, NJ 07060 / US | 02 /
MORRISON, Mary E. 3 Sleepy Oaks Lane Houston, TX 77024 / US | 03 /
DAWSON, Charles Rapier 2303 Dunstan Houston, TX 77005 / US | [1981/41] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/24] | Rinuy, Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée F-75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1981/41] | Rinuy, Guy 14, Avenue de la Grande Armée F-75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 80902145.4 | 24.09.1980 | [1981/41] | WO1980US01237 | Priority number, date | US19790079436 | 27.09.1979 Original published format: US 79436 | [1981/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8100874 | Date: | 02.04.1981 | [1981/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0037418 | Date: | 14.10.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0037418 | Date: | 03.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1982 | Classification | IPC: | E21B21/12, E21B33/13, E21B33/138, C08K3/34, C08K5/01 | [1981/41] | CPC: |
C09K8/502 (EP);
C09K8/516 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR [1981/41] | Title | German: | DURCH SCHERKRAFT VERDICKENDE FLÜSSIGKEIT | [1981/41] | English: | SHEAR THICKENING FLUID | [1981/41] | French: | FLUIDE D'EPAISSISSEMENT PAR CISAILLEMENT | [1981/41] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.1981 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.1981 | Search fee paid | 27.05.1981 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.1981 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.1981 | Examination requested [1981/41] | 24.03.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.12.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3145774 [ ]; | GB471637 [ ]; | US3259572 [ ] | International search | [A]US2775557 ; | [A]US3070543 ; | [A]US3081260 ; | [A]US3082823 ; | [A]US3407878 ; | [X]US3448800 ; | [P]US4182417 ; | [X]GB2008171 ; | [A]US3746725 ; | [A]US3838047 ; | [A]US3893510 ; | [A]US4042031 | [X] - DERWENT ABSTRACT 59298 Soviet Union 629322 Published September 6, 1978 | [X] - DERWENT ABSTRACT 36479 DL124430 Published February 23, 1977. |