EP0033086 - Drilling tool with indexable drill bit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.1984 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.10.1984 [1984/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firma Gottlieb Gühring Jakobstrasse 10-13 D-7470 Ebingen / DE | [1981/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schröder, Karl-Heinz Goldregenweg 3 D-7483 Inzigkofen 1 / DE | [1981/31] | Representative(s) | Grupe, Peter Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne Gruppe-Pellmann-Dragotti Bavariaring 4 D-8000 München 2 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/31] | Grupe, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne Gruppe-Pellmann-Dragotti Bavariaring 4 D-8000 München 2 / DE | Application number, filing date | 81100202.1 | 13.01.1981 | [1981/31] | Priority number, date | DE19803001120 | 14.01.1980 Original published format: DE 3001120 | [1981/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0033086 | Date: | 05.08.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0033086 | Date: | 12.10.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B23B51/00 | [1981/31] | CPC: |
B23B51/00 (EP);
B23B2251/48 (EP);
B23B2251/50 (EP);
B23B2260/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/31] | Title | German: | Bohrwerkzeug mit einem Wendebohrmesser | [1981/31] | English: | Drilling tool with indexable drill bit | [1981/31] | French: | Outil de perçage avec plaquette indexable | [1981/31] | Examination procedure | 27.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/01] | 04.01.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.03.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US2400856 [ ] (JOHN THOMPSON) | Examination | US1931590 | US4047826 |