EP0034698 - Storing substance for storing latent heat, and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.1983 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laing, Oliver Hofener Weg 35-37 D-7148 Remseck 2 - Aldingen / DE | [1981/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schaper, Peter, Dr. Am Remsufer 8/4 D-7148 Remseck-1 / DE | 02 /
Laing, Oliver, Dipl.Phys. Hofenerweg 37 D-7148 Remseck-2 / DE | [1981/35] | Application number, filing date | 81100283.1 | 16.01.1981 | [1981/35] | Priority number, date | DE19803001903 | 19.01.1980 Original published format: DE 3001903 | [1981/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0034698 | Date: | 02.09.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/06 | [1981/35] | CPC: |
C09K5/063 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1981/35] | Title | German: | Speichermasse zur Speicherung latenter Wärme und ihre Anwendung | [1981/35] | English: | Storing substance for storing latent heat, and its use | [1981/35] | French: | Produit accumulant la chaleur latente et son utilisation | [1981/35] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 11.02.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1983/29] | 22.04.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.03.1982 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE112245 [ ] (DEUTSCHE THERMOP AG [DE]); | US1656366 [ ] (STERLING FREDERICK W, et al); | FR1050933 [ ]; | DE2639173 [ ] (UNIV DELAWARE); | DE2753598 [ ] (FRIDERICHS PETER) |