EP0036471 - Process for the electrophoretic deposition of a coating on an electric conducting workpiece acting as the cathode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/39] | Aqueous dispersion based on a cationic synthetic resin and use thereof in electrophoretic lacquering | ||
[1983/26] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 09.04.1985 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Farben + Fasern Aktiengesellschaft Am Neumarkt 30 D-2000 Hamburg 70 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/39] | For all designated states BASF Farben + Fasern Aktiengesellschaft Am Neumarkt 30 D-2000 Hamburg 70 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Diefenbach, Horst, Dr. Lerchenhain 8 D-4405 Nottuln / DE | 02 /
Dobbelstein, Arnold, Dr. Emil-Nolde-Weg 95 D-4400 Münster / DE | [1981/39] | Representative(s) | Habbel, Hans-Georg Postfach 34 29 48019 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/39] | Habbel, Hans-Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 34 29 D-48019 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 81100384.7 | 20.01.1981 | [1981/39] | Priority number, date | DE19803002865 | 28.01.1980 Original published format: DE 3002865 | [1981/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0036471 | Date: | 30.09.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0036471 | Date: | 29.06.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/40, C25D13/06 | [1981/39] | CPC: |
C09D5/4457 (EP);
C08G18/0814 (EP);
C08G18/4081 (EP);
C09D5/4473 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur elektrophoretischen Abscheidung eines Überzuges auf ein als Kathode geschaltetes, elektrisch leitfähiges Werkstück | [1983/26] | English: | Process for the electrophoretic deposition of a coating on an electric conducting workpiece acting as the cathode | [1983/26] | French: | Procédé pour le dépôt électrophorétique d'un revêtement sur une pièce conductrice de l'électricité connectée comme cathode | [1983/26] |
Former [1981/39] | Wässrige Dispersion auf der Basis kationischen Kunstharzes und deren Verwendung in der Elektrotauchlackierung | ||
Former [1981/39] | Aqueous dispersion based on a cationic synthetic resin and use thereof in electrophoretic lacquering | ||
Former [1981/39] | Dispersion aqueuse à base de résine synthétique cationique et son application à l'électrophorèse | Examination procedure | 24.07.1981 | Examination requested [1981/41] | 18.03.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.12.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.03.1984
27.03.1984
ADMISSIBLE Herberts GmbH & Co. KG Christbusch 25 D-42285 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Türk, Dietmar, et al, et al Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | 02
24.03.1984
06.06.1984
ADMISSIBLE Hüls Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung/PB 15 D-45764 Marl / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.03.1984
27.03.1984
ADMISSIBLE Herberts GmbH Christbusch 25 D-42285 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Türk, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat., et al, et al Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
24.03.1984
06.06.1984
ADMISSIBLE Hüls Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung/PB 15 D-45764 Marl / DE | |||
Former [1984/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.03.1984
27.03.1984
ADMISSIBLE Herberts GmbH Christbusch 25 D-42285 Wuppertal / DE Opponent's representative Türk, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat., et al, et al Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | 08.06.1984 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.11.1984 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.11.1984 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 10.12.1984 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1985/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.01.1984 | SE | 21.01.1984 | NL | 01.08.1984 | FR | 28.09.1984 | DE | 02.10.1984 | [2015/21] |
Former [1998/51] | AT | 20.01.1984 | |
SE | 21.01.1984 | ||
CH | 31.01.1984 | ||
LI | 31.01.1984 | ||
NL | 01.08.1984 | ||
FR | 28.09.1984 | ||
DE | 02.10.1984 | ||
Former [1986/23] | AT | 20.01.1984 | |
SE | 21.01.1984 | ||
CH | 31.01.1984 | ||
LI | 31.01.1984 | ||
NL | 01.08.1984 | ||
DE | 02.10.1984 | ||
Former [1986/12] | SE | 21.01.1984 | |
CH | 31.01.1984 | ||
LI | 31.01.1984 | ||
NL | 01.08.1984 | ||
DE | 02.10.1984 | ||
Former [1985/28] | CH | 31.01.1984 | |
LI | 31.01.1984 | ||
NL | 01.08.1984 | ||
DE | 02.10.1984 | ||
Former [1985/23] | CH | 31.01.1984 | |
LI | 31.01.1984 | ||
NL | 01.08.1984 | ||
Former [1985/15] | CH | 31.01.1984 | |
LI | 31.01.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP53094346 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 90, Nr. 4, Januar 1979, seite 82, Nr. 24870t Columbus, Ohio, U.S.A. & JP-A-53 094 346 (Shinto Paint Co., Ltd.) 18-08-1978 * zusammenfassung *, & JP53094346 A 00000000 |