EP0034806 - Apparatus for rolling rings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1984 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brück, Bruno Jakob Brückstrasse 15 D-6601 Ensheim / DE | [1981/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1981/35] | Representative(s) | Boecker, Carl Otto Dr. Ehrhardt-Strasse 31 D-6670 St. Ingbert (Saar) / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/35] | Boecker, Carl Otto, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Ehrhardt-Strasse 31 D-6670 St. Ingbert (Saar) / DE | Application number, filing date | 81101175.8 | 19.02.1981 | [1981/35] | Priority number, date | DE19803006294 | 20.02.1980 Original published format: DE 3006294 | [1981/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0034806 | Date: | 02.09.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0034806 | Date: | 19.10.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B21H1/06 | [1981/35] | CPC: |
B21H1/06 (EP);
B21B2035/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/35] | Title | German: | Ringwalzwerk | [1981/35] | English: | Apparatus for rolling rings | [1981/35] | French: | Machine à laminer des anneaux | [1981/35] | Examination procedure | 01.03.1982 | Examination requested [1982/19] | 27.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.03.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 29.02.1984 | [1999/52] | Cited in | Examination | DE658592 | FR2183988 | DE2504969 |