EP0034825 - Removal of residual acrylonitrile monomer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.1984 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLYSAR INTERNATIONAL S.A. P.O. Box 1063 Route de Beaumont 10 1071 Fribourg / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1983/05] | For all designated states POLYSAR INTERNATIONAL S.A. P.O. Box 1063 Route de Beaumont 10 CH-1071 Fribourg / CH | ||
Former [1981/35] | For all designated states The B.F. GOODRICH Company 500 South Main Street Akron, Ohio 44318 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miller, James Roland 3659 Brecksville Road Richfield Ohio 44286 / US | [1981/35] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | von Kreisler, Alek, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1983/05] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1981/35] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 81101243.4 | 21.02.1981 | [1981/35] | Priority number, date | US19800124039 | 25.02.1980 Original published format: US 124039 | [1981/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0034825 | Date: | 02.09.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0034825 | Date: | 16.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C08F6/00, C08F20/44, C02F1/70 | [1981/50] | CPC: |
C08F6/006 (EP,US);
C02F2101/38 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1981/36] | C08F6/00, C08F6/00, C02F1/00 | ||
Former IPC [1981/35] | C08F20/44, C08F6/00, C02F1/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1981/35] | Title | German: | Entfernung von rückständigem Acrylnitrilmonomer | [1981/35] | English: | Removal of residual acrylonitrile monomer | [1981/35] | French: | Elimination de monomère résiduel d'acrylonitrile | [1981/35] | Examination procedure | 28.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/27] | 31.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1984 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1984/19] | Divisional application(s) | EP83111326.1 / EP0113830 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2034172 [ ]; | US4251412 [ ] (FERRINI GINO P); | FR2347315 [ ] (ERDOELCHEMIE GMBH [DE]) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 72, no. 25, June 22, 1970, page 297, abstract 132000wColumbus, Ohio, US E.I. BYALAYA : " Direct ammonolysis of acrylonitrile " & Khim. Farm. Zh. 1969, 3(12)40-1 |