EP0035695 - Process and apparatus for producing aqueous sodium chloride solutions from rock salt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/37] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benninger, Siegfried, Dr. Mecklenburger Strasse 37 D-6231 Schwalbach / DE | 02 /
Reining, Karl Sendelbacher Weg 19 D-6233 Kelkheim (Taunus) / DE | 03 /
Krasel, Werner Brückenstrasse 53 D-6238 Hofheim am Taunus / DE | [1981/37] | Application number, filing date | 81101346.5 | 25.02.1981 | [1981/37] | Priority number, date | DE19803008563 | 06.03.1980 Original published format: DE 3008563 | [1981/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0035695 | Date: | 16.09.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0035695 | Date: | 13.04.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C01D3/08 | [1981/37] | CPC: |
C01D3/08 (EP,US);
B01F21/15 (EP,US);
B01F21/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, SE [1981/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung wässriger Natriumchlorid-Lösungen aus Steinsalz | [1981/37] | English: | Process and apparatus for producing aqueous sodium chloride solutions from rock salt | [1981/37] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la production d'une solution aqueuse de chlorure de sodium à partir de sel gemme | [1981/37] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1981 | Examination requested [1981/51] | 15.07.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.09.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | Examination | DE2643341 | US3130016 | US2551494 | US3623848 | CA885913 | US3365280 | US1928008 | DE2215949 | FR1578208 |