EP0035704 - Process for the preparation of 2,4,6-trifluorotriazine-(1,3,5) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/37] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klauke, Erich, Dr. Eichendorffweg 8 D-5062 Odenthal / DE | 02 /
Kysela, Ernst, Dr. Virchowstrasse 14 D-5060 Berg.-Gladbach 3 / DE | 03 /
Stüwe, Arnd, Dr. Pommernweg 11 D-2212 Brunsbuettel / DE | 04 /
Dorlars, Alfons, Dr. Mozartstrasse 32 D-5090 Leverkusen / DE | [1981/37] | Application number, filing date | 81101398.6 | 26.02.1981 | [1981/37] | Priority number, date | DE19803008923 | 08.03.1980 Original published format: DE 3008923 | [1981/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0035704 | Date: | 16.09.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0035704 | Date: | 26.01.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07D251/28 | [1981/37] | CPC: |
C07D251/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1981/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 2,4,6-Trifluortriazin-(1,3,5) | [1981/37] | English: | Process for the preparation of 2,4,6-trifluorotriazine-(1,3,5) | [1981/37] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de la trifluoro-2,4,6 triazine-1,3,5 | [1981/37] | Examination procedure | 06.03.1981 | Examination requested [1981/37] | 03.05.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.07.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2643335 [ ] (BAYER AG); | DE2643251 [ ] (BAYER AG); | DE2729762 [ ] (BAYER AG); | DE2814450 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY AG) |