EP0040295 - Arrangement of strip coilers in a sheet rolling mill [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/47] | Arrangement for hot rolling of metal | ||
[1984/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.05.1985 [1985/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hoesch Aktiengesellschaft Eberhardstrasse 12 44145 Dortmund / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/47] | For all designated states Hoesch Aktiengesellschaft Eberhardstrasse 12 D-44145 Dortmund / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grasshoff, Hans Wilhelm, Dr.-Ing. Kirschweg 2 D-4600 Dortmund 30 / DE | [1981/47] | Application number, filing date | 81101482.8 | 02.03.1981 | [1981/47] | Priority number, date | DE19803019123 | 20.05.1980 Original published format: DE 3019123 | [1981/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0040295 | Date: | 25.11.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0040295 | Date: | 23.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B21B1/34 | [1981/47] | CPC: |
B21B45/004 (EP,US);
B21B1/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1981/47] | Title | German: | Anordnung einer Speichervorrichtung in einer Bandstrasse | [1984/21] | English: | Arrangement of strip coilers in a sheet rolling mill | [1984/21] | French: | Arrangement de bobineuses dans un train de laminage de tôles | [1984/21] |
Former [1981/47] | Anordnung zum Warmwalzen von Metallwerkstücken | ||
Former [1981/47] | Arrangement for hot rolling of metal | ||
Former [1981/47] | Installation pour le laminage à chaud de métaux | Examination procedure | 30.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/28] | 17.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.09.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.02.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR819126 [ ]; | DE693406 [ ] (SCHLOEMANN AG); | DE906086 [ ] (SIEMAG VERTRIEBSGESELLSCHAFT) |