EP0045346 - Tennis practice backboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.1984 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.1984 [1984/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lombardi, John P. 109 Biscayne Court Sterling Virginia / US | For all designated states Hult, Tore M. 9104 Quinton Drive Bethesda Maryland / US | For all designated states Trowbridge, Robert H., Jr. P.O. Box 581 Leesburg Virginia / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/06] | For all designated states Lombardi, John P. 109 Biscayne Court Sterling Virginia / US | ||
For all designated states Hult, Tore M. 9104 Quinton Drive Bethesda Maryland / US | |||
For all designated states Trowbridge, Robert H., Jr. P.O. Box 581 Leesburg Virginia / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/06] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/06] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 81101690.6 | 07.03.1981 | [1982/06] | Priority number, date | US19800175743 | 06.08.1980 Original published format: US 175743 | [1982/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0045346 | Date: | 10.02.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A63B69/38 | [1982/06] | CPC: |
A63B69/0097 (EP,US);
A63B2210/50 (EP,US);
Y10S273/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/06] | Title | German: | Tennis-Übungswand | [1982/06] | English: | Tennis practice backboard | [1982/06] | French: | Paroi d'entraînement pour le tennis | [1982/06] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 04.08.1982 | Examination requested [1982/41] | 23.08.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/30] | 15.02.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1984/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2630772 [ ] (GUT LEO); | DE2558968 [ ] (STEINKOPFF DIETRICH); | AU5246373 [ ] (STOCKMAN A O G); | CH545114 [ ] (GAMESTOWN SOC [CH]); | DE2606071 [ ] (SPANNBETONWERK KOCH KG); | US3697068 [ ] (MCDOUGALL JULIA P); | DE2542984 [ ] (SPANNBETONWERK KOCH KG); | DE555523 [ ] (HEINRICH LUSTIG); | DE8010714U [ ] |