EP0037909 - Step-like sharpened helical gear-shaped cutter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.1985 [1985/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maag-Zahnräder und -Maschinen Aktiengesellschaft Hardstrasse 219 CH-8023 Zürich / CH | [1981/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clarenbach, Johannes, Dipl.-Ing. Bernsteinweg 5 D-7506 Herrenalb / DE | [1981/42] | Representative(s) | Travnicek, Richard Maag Zahnräder & -Maschinen Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung Postfach CH-8023 Zürich / CH | [1985/39] |
Former [1981/42] | Hotz, Klaus, Dipl.-El.-Ing. / ETH Maag Zahnräder und -Maschinen Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung Postfach CH-8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 81101905.8 | 14.03.1981 | [1981/42] | Priority number, date | CH19800002735 | 10.04.1980 Original published format: CH 273580 | [1981/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0037909 | Date: | 21.10.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0037909 | Date: | 26.05.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0037909 | Date: | 28.11.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B23F21/10 | [1981/42] | CPC: |
B23F21/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1981/42] | Title | German: | Schrägschneidrad mit Treppenscharfschliff | [1981/42] | English: | Step-like sharpened helical gear-shaped cutter | [1981/42] | French: | Outil pignon hélicoidal à affûtage en escalier | [1981/42] | Examination procedure | 07.09.1982 | Examination requested [1982/46] | 21.07.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.09.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.01.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.05.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1447376 [ ] | [ ] - Deutsche Normen, DIN 1829 - Teil 1 November 1977, Berlin "Schneidrader fur Stirnrader" seiten 1 bis 16 |