EP0037003 - 2,3-Dichloro-2-trifluoromethyl-1,1,1,3,4,4,5,5,5-nonafluoropentane and process for its preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.1984 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.08.1984 [1984/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/40] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
von Halasz, Sigmar-Peter, Dr. Feldbergstrasse 50 D-6233 Kelkheim (Taunus) / DE | [1981/40] | Application number, filing date | 81101974.4 | 17.03.1981 | [1981/40] | Priority number, date | DE19803012005 | 28.03.1980 Original published format: DE 3012005 | [1981/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0037003 | Date: | 07.10.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0037003 | Date: | 24.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C07C19/08, C07C17/04 | [1981/40] | CPC: |
H01B3/24 (EP,US);
C07C17/04 (EP,US);
C07C19/10 (EP,US);
C10M105/52 (EP,US);
C11D7/5018 (EP,US);
C23G5/02812 (EP,US);
D06L1/02 (EP,US);
C10M2211/022 (EP,US);
C10M2211/06 (EP,US);
C10N2040/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/04, C07C19/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1981/40] | Title | German: | 2,3-Dichlor-2-trifluormethyl-1,1,1,3,4,4,5,5,5-nonafluorpentan und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1981/40] | English: | 2,3-Dichloro-2-trifluoromethyl-1,1,1,3,4,4,5,5,5-nonafluoropentane and process for its preparation | [1981/40] | French: | 2,3-Dichlor-2-trifluorméthyl-1,1,1,3,4,4,5,5,5-nonafluor pentane et procédé pour sa préparation | [1981/40] | Examination procedure | 30.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/01] | 14.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.01.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.05.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - Houben-Weyl: "Methoden der Organoschen Chemie", 4. Auflage, Band V-3. Halogenverbindungen, 1962. Georg Thieme Verlag, seiten 532-542 Stuttgart, DE. * seiten 540-542 * | [ ] - Journal of the American Chemical Society, Band 84, 20. August 1962, seiten 3148-3153 Easton, U.S.A. J.F. HARRIS JR.; "The Free-Radical Addition of Trifluoromethanesulfenyl Chloride to Haloolefins" * Tabel II, Verbindungen VIIa und VIIb * |