EP0037982 - Method of making shaped crystalline aluminosilicates catalysts, and use of the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.1983 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/42] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weisser, Jürgen, Dr. Südstrasse 15 D-4047 Dormagen 11 / DE | 02 /
Grolig, Johann, Dr. Heinrich-Lübke-Strasse 22 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 03 /
Scharfe, Gerhard, Dr. Berta-von-Suttner-Strasse 69 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | [1981/42] | Application number, filing date | 81102514.7 | 03.04.1981 | [1981/42] | Priority number, date | DE19803014637 | 16.04.1980 Original published format: DE 3014637 | [1981/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0037982 | Date: | 21.10.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B01J29/28, C01B33/28 | [1981/42] | CPC: |
C07C6/123 (EP);
B01J29/06 (EP);
C01B33/2876 (EP);
C07C1/20 (EP);
C07C2/00 (EP);
C07C2/66 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C07C2/00, C07C15/00 (EP);
C07C5/2708, C07C15/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1981/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung geformter Katalysatoren auf der Basis kristalliner Aluminiumsilikate und deren Verwendung | [1981/42] | English: | Method of making shaped crystalline aluminosilicates catalysts, and use of the same | [1981/42] | French: | Procédé de production de catalyseurs façonnés à base d'aluminosilicates cristallins et leur utilisation | [1981/42] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 03.04.1981 | Examination requested [1982/01] | 21.07.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 20.07.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.11.1983 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1984/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1567861 [ ]; | DE2643928 [ ]; | DE1467129 [ ]; | US3515682 [ ]; | US4091007 [ ]; | GB1099073 [ ]; | US3422033 [ ] |