EP0038481 - Method and apparatus for producing moulded pieces of unsaturated polyester polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.1984 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.1984 [1984/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/43] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gehrig, Heinz, Dr. Spinozastrasse 30 D-6750 Kaiserslautern / DE | 02 /
Page, Norbert Heinrich-Heine-Strasse 12 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
Schwarz, Dieter Wissmannstrasse 93 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1984/33] |
Former [1981/43] | 01 /
Gehrig, Heinz, Dr. Spinozastrasse 30 D-6750 Kaiserslautern / DE | ||
02 /
Page, Norbert Heinrich-Heine-Strasse 12 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
03 /
Scharz, Dieter Wissmannstrasse 93 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 81102700.2 | 09.04.1981 | [1981/43] | Priority number, date | DE19803015417 | 22.04.1980 Original published format: DE 3015417 | [1981/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0038481 | Date: | 28.10.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0038481 | Date: | 07.12.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B29D27/02, B29F3/00 | [1983/49] | CPC: |
B29C44/367 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1981/43] | B29D27/02 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1981/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Formteilen aus ungesättigten Polyesterharzen | [1981/43] | English: | Method and apparatus for producing moulded pieces of unsaturated polyester polymers | [1981/43] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication de pièces moulées à partir de polymères de polyesters non saturés | [1981/43] | Examination procedure | 05.09.1981 | Examination requested [1981/46] | 15.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.05.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2255328 [ ] (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]); | US3421932 [ ] (MCGREGOR WILLIAM A JR, et al); | CH460324 [ ] (BAYER AG [DE]); | GB1070948 [ ] (METZELER AG); | GB772344 [ ] (DU PONT); | GB1038313 [ ] (ICI LTD); | FR2143281 [ ] (ZIPPEL RICHARD) |