EP0039788 - Copper complexes, their preparation, their use in controlling plant pests and agents therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.1984 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.10.1984 [1984/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/46] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kraft, Helmut Hirtenweg 131 D-6719 Wattenheim / DE | 02 /
Schumacher, Heinz Karlsruher Strasse 19 D-6940 Weinheim / DE | 03 /
Pommer, Ernst-Heinrich, Dr. Berliner Platz 7 D-6703 Limburgerhof / DE | 04 /
Schlotterbeck, Dietrich, Dr. Mainzer Strasse 38 D-6703 Limburgerhof / DE | 05 /
Ley, Gregor, Dr. In den Trankstuecken D-6719 Wattenheim / DE | [1981/46] | Application number, filing date | 81102722.6 | 10.04.1981 | [1981/46] | Priority number, date | DE19803017123 | 03.05.1980 Original published format: DE 3017123 | DE19803022432 | 14.06.1980 Original published format: DE 3022432 | DE19803039409 | 18.10.1980 Original published format: DE 3039409 | [1981/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0039788 | Date: | 18.11.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0039788 | Date: | 25.11.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0039788 | Date: | 28.09.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A01N37/02, A01N37/04, A01N37/06, C07C53/126, C07C55/02, C07C57/12, C08F8/44 | [1981/46] | CPC: |
A01N37/04 (EP,US);
A01N37/02 (EP,US);
A01N37/06 (EP,US);
A01N59/20 (EP,US);
C07C53/126 (EP,US);
C07C55/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A01N59/20, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N59/20, A01N25/10 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/46] | Title | German: | Kupferkomplexe, ihre Herstellung, ihre Verwendung zur Bekämpfung von Pflanzenschädlingen und Mittel dafür | [1981/46] | English: | Copper complexes, their preparation, their use in controlling plant pests and agents therefor | [1981/46] | French: | Complexes de cuivre, leur préparation, leur utilisation pour combattre les parasites des végétaux et agents à cet effet | [1981/46] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1981 | Examination requested [1981/52] | 13.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.11.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.03.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB593416 (NUODEX PRODUCTS CO INC); | [X]GB599443 (STEVENSONS DYERS LTD, et al); | [X]FR970321 (CIBA GEIGY); | [X]FR1590623 ; | [X]DE2202448 (HAGER AB); | [XD]GB1394990 (HYDROPHILICS INT INC); | [X]US4020180 (WOERNER HANS); | [XD]DE2807293 (BP CHEM INT LTD); | [X]US4193993 (HILDITCH EDWARD A [GB]) |