EP0039013 - Extrusion method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.1983 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASEA AB S-721 83 Västeras / SE | [1981/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larsson, Hans Gunnar, Ing. Eriksgatan 24 S-724 60 Västeräs / SE | [1981/44] | Representative(s) | Boecker, Joachim Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 60313 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/44] | Boecker, Joachim, Dr.-Ing. Adelonstrasse 58 D-65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 81102952.9 | 16.04.1981 | [1981/44] | Priority number, date | SE19800003139 | 25.04.1980 Original published format: SE 8003139 | [1981/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0039013 | Date: | 04.11.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/20 | [1981/44] | CPC: |
B22F3/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [1981/44] | Title | German: | Strangpressverfahren | [1981/44] | English: | Extrusion method | [1981/44] | French: | Procédé d'extrusion | [1981/44] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 06.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/36] | 15.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1983 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1984/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.05.1983 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1129039 [ ] (HEINZ SCHMALZ DR ING); | US3344507 [ ] (DEREK GREEN); | FR1576752 [ ]; | US3922763 [ ] (BUERGER DOUGLAS JAY) |