EP0042931 - Magnetic disk initialization method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1985 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/01] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baxter, Duane Willard 503 8th Avenue SW Rochester Minnesota 55901 / US | 02 /
Evjen, Joseph Lewis, Jr. 1810 34th Street NW Rochester Minnesota 55901 / US | 03 /
Hoveland, William Charles 932 28th Street NW Rochester Minnesota 55901 / US | 04 /
Roble, Roy Arnold Route 2, Box 289 Byron Minnesota 55920 / US | 05 /
Smith, Donald Raymond 2115 20th Avenue NW Rochester Minnesota 55901 / US | 06 /
Wirz, John Henry Route 1 Pine Island Minnesota 55963 / US | [1982/01] | Representative(s) | Petersen, Richard Courtenay, et al IBM United Kingdom Patent Operations Hursley Park Winchester Hants. SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/01] | Petersen, Richard Courtenay, et al IBM United Kingdom Patent Operations Hursley Park Winchester Hants. SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 81103167.3 | 28.04.1981 | [1982/01] | Priority number, date | US19800164727 | 30.06.1980 Original published format: US 164727 | [1982/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0042931 | Date: | 06.01.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0042931 | Date: | 12.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0042931 | Date: | 18.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/58, G11B27/00, G11B21/10 | [1982/19] | CPC: |
G11B5/59655 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1982/01] | G11B5/58, G11B27/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1982/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Initialisierung von Magnetplatten | [1984/29] | English: | Magnetic disk initialization method | [1982/01] | French: | Procédé d'initialisation de disques magnétiques | [1982/01] |
Former [1982/01] | Verfahren zur Initialisierung von Magnetscheiben | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 23.06.1982 | Examination requested [1982/35] | 11.02.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.10.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 18.07.1984 | [1999/42] | Documents cited: | Search | JP54158206 [ ]; | JP5374009 [ ]; | JP54158207 [ ]; | JPS54158207 [ ] (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO); | JPS54158206 [ ] (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO); | JPS5374009 [ ] (FUJITSU LTD) | [ ] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN Vol. 4, No. 18, 13 February 1980 page 75E171 & JP - A - 54 - 158206, & JP54158206 A 19800213 | [ ] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN Vol. 2, No. 108, 8 September 1978 page 5816E78 & JP - A - 53 - 74009, & JP5374009 A 19780908 | [ ] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN Vol. 4, No. 18, 13 February 1980 page 75E171 & JP - A - 54 - 158207, & JP54158207 A 19800213 |